THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:02:26 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Goa Medical College, 2010
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GUJARATI, HINDI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GUJARATI, HINDI
Medical School: Goa Medical College, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Goa Medical College, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 20 Jul 2021
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 17 Apr 2020
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 24 Sep 2019
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 22 Mar 2019
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 17 May 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 21 Feb 2018
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 20 Jul 2021

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 17 Apr 2020

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2019

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 22 Mar 2019

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 17 May 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Feb 2018
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 21 Feb 2018