THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 04:43:16 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2016
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 30 Bond St
Toronto ON M5B 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4168645734
Fax: 4168643055

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematology
Effective: 23 Sep 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 23 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Nova Scotia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 30 Bond St
Toronto ON M5B 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4168645734
Fax: 4168643055

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematology
Effective: 23 Sep 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 23 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Nova Scotia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RONALD RAN YAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RONALD RAN YAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 21 Aug 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 01 May 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Apr 2018
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Sep 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 21 Aug 2018

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jul 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 01 May 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Apr 2018