THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 03:16:39 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2008
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ITALIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematology
Effective: 07 Nov 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 28 Jul 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 07 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 28 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Please contact the Ottawa Hospital to obtain a copy of your medical records.

Secretary (Catherine): 613 737 8899 x 73034

Tel: 613-737-8899 ext 72444
Date Received: 21 Jun 2024

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Johnathan Mack Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 15 Mar 2024

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ITALIAN
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematology
Effective: 07 Nov 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 28 Jul 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 07 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 28 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Please contact the Ottawa Hospital to obtain a copy of your medical records.

Secretary (Catherine): 613 737 8899 x 73034

Tel: 613-737-8899 ext 72444
Date Received: 21 Jun 2024

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Johnathan Mack Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 15 Mar 2024

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHNATHAN PAUL MACK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHNATHAN PAUL MACK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Calgary, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Feb 2018
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Feb 2018