THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:02:35 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 2011
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 22 Oct 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Hematology
Effective: 04 Nov 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 22 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 04 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 22 Oct 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Hematology
Effective: 04 Nov 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 22 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 04 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 2011
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Hematology
01 Jul 2019 to 29 Feb 2020
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Hematology
01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Hematology
01 Mar 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Hematology
DATE: 01 Jul 2019 to 29 Feb 2020
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Hematology
DATE: 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Hematology
DATE: 01 Mar 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 29 Feb 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Mar 2018
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 29 Feb 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Mar 2018