THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 04:55:06 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Weill Cornell Medical College in Qatar, 2011
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ARABIC, CREOLE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 475 Charolais Blvd
Brampton Ontario L6Y 0M2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9054543347
Fax: 9054543288
Address: Suite 2-4
7070 Saint Barbara Blvd.
Mississauga Ontario L5W0E6
Phone: 9055659100
Fax: 9055658973

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 27 Mar 2018
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 27 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Arizona

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Tasnim Khalife Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 21 Dec 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ARABIC, CREOLE
Medical School: Weill Cornell Medical College in Qatar, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 475 Charolais Blvd
Brampton Ontario L6Y 0M2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9054543347
Fax: 9054543288
Address: Suite 2-4
7070 Saint Barbara Blvd.
Mississauga Ontario L5W0E6
Phone: 9055659100
Fax: 9055658973

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 27 Mar 2018
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 27 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Arizona

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Tasnim Khalife Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 21 Dec 2022

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
23 Aug 2019
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Aug 23 2019
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Tasnim Khalife may practise medicine independently in family medicine.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Tasnim Khalife may practise medicine independently in family medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Weill Cornell Medical College in Qatar, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 23 Aug 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 27 Mar 2018
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 23 Aug 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Mar 2018
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 27 Mar 2018