THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:50:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Manchester Medical School, 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 203-600 Princess St
Woodstock ON N4S 4H4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-421-7252
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 25 York St
Telus Health My Care
Toronto ON M5J 2V5
Phone: 855-577-8838
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 203-600 Princess St
Woodstock ON N4S 4H4
Phone: 519-421-7252
Fax: 519-421-9924

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 25 Apr 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 25 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU
Medical School: Manchester Medical School, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 203-600 Princess St
Woodstock ON N4S 4H4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-421-7252
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 25 York St
Telus Health My Care
Toronto ON M5J 2V5
Phone: 855-577-8838
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 203-600 Princess St
Woodstock ON N4S 4H4
Phone: 519-421-7252
Fax: 519-421-9924

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 25 Apr 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 25 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NAFEESA RAMZAN KHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NAFEESA RAMZAN KHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Manchester Medical School, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Dec 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Dec 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 29 Mar 2018
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 11 Dec 2019

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Dec 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Mar 2018
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 29 Mar 2018