THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:25:44 AM

General Information

Former Name: Fonseka, Rashmi Natasha (Used Until: 15 Nov 2022) Samarasinghe, Rashmi Natasha (Used Until: 24 Feb 2021)
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2014
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 14872 Yonge St
Enhanced Care Clinic - Aurora
Aurora ON L4G 1N2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-505-0950
Fax: 905-841-9404
Address: B1-25 William Graham Dr
Enhanced Care Clinic Aurora East
Aurora ON L4G 3G3
Phone: 905-841-3450
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Fountain Medical and Wellness
9625 Yonge St., Unit # 2
Richmond Hill, ON
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 5T2
Phone: 905-237-7538
Fax: 905-237-7539
Address: 1-13175 Yonge St
Children's Treatment Network
Richmond Hill ON L4E 0G6
Phone: (905) 773-4779
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 01 May 2018
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 01 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: Fonseka, Rashmi Natasha (Used Until: 15 Nov 2022) Samarasinghe, Rashmi Natasha (Used Until: 24 Feb 2021)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 14872 Yonge St
Enhanced Care Clinic - Aurora
Aurora ON L4G 1N2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-505-0950
Fax: 905-841-9404
Address: B1-25 William Graham Dr
Enhanced Care Clinic Aurora East
Aurora ON L4G 3G3
Phone: 905-841-3450
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Fountain Medical and Wellness
9625 Yonge St., Unit # 2
Richmond Hill, ON
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 5T2
Phone: 905-237-7538
Fax: 905-237-7539
Address: 1-13175 Yonge St
Children's Treatment Network
Richmond Hill ON L4E 0G6
Phone: (905) 773-4779
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 01 May 2018
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 01 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
01 Aug 2019
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Aug 01 2019
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Rashmi Natasha Samarasinghe may practise medicine independently in
pediatrics.



VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Rashmi Natasha Samarasinghe may practise medicine independently in
pediatrics.



Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 01 Aug 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 May 2018
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 May 2018
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 May 2018