THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:38:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Umm Al-Qura University Faculty of Medicine, 2012
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 550 Wellington Road
Parkwood Institute
Main Building and Mental Health
4th floor (PCU)
London Ontario N6C 4R3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 646-6100
Extension: 42511
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Aug 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 24 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care London - Parkwood Hospital London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care London - Parkwood Hospital
LOCATION: London

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: Umm Al-Qura University Faculty of Medicine, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 550 Wellington Road
Parkwood Institute
Main Building and Mental Health
4th floor (PCU)
London Ontario N6C 4R3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 646-6100
Extension: 42511
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Aug 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 24 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care London - Parkwood Hospital London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care London - Parkwood Hospital
LOCATION: London

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MOHAMMED ISMAIL A BADAWI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BADAWI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MOHAMMED ISMAIL A BADAWI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BADAWI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Umm Al-Qura University Faculty of Medicine, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Oct 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 29 Aug 2021
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 07 May 2018
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Oct 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 29 Aug 2021

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 May 2018