THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:25:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: King Abdulaziz University College of Medicine, 2012
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6A 5A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5196633976
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 07 Nov 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 07 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: King Abdulaziz University College of Medicine, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6A 5A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5196633976
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 07 Nov 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 07 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MOHAMMED OTHMAN F ALSAGER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALSAGER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MOHAMMED OTHMAN F ALSAGER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALSAGER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: King Abdulaziz University College of Medicine, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Dec 2022
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 07 Apr 2018
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Dec 2022

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Apr 2018