THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 06:39:50 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Imam Abdulrahman Bin Faisal University College of Medicine, 2016
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 40 Ruskin Street
University of Ottawa Heart Institute
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4W7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5142292819
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1355 Bank Street
Ottawa Ontario K1H8K7
Phone: 6137381584
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Imam Abdulrahman Bin Faisal University College of Medicine, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 40 Ruskin Street
University of Ottawa Heart Institute
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4W7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5142292819
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1355 Bank Street
Ottawa Ontario K1H8K7
Phone: 6137381584
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AHMED ABDULFATTAH A ALDAJANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALDAJANI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AHMED ABDULFATTAH A ALDAJANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALDAJANI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Imam Abdulrahman Bin Faisal University College of Medicine, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 25 Sep 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jun 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 10 Apr 2018
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Jun 2024

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 25 Sep 2022

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Aug 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2021

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Jun 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Apr 2018