THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 06:15:02 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 600 Peter Morand Crescent
School of Epidemiology and Public Health
Ottawa Ontario K1G 5Z3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-562-5800
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Public Health and Preventive Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 25 Jun 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Public Health and Preventive Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 25 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 600 Peter Morand Crescent
School of Epidemiology and Public Health
Ottawa Ontario K1G 5Z3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-562-5800
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Public Health and Preventive Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 25 Jun 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Public Health and Preventive Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 25 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LISA KATHRYN FREEMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FREEMAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LISA KATHRYN FREEMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FREEMAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Apr 2018
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Apr 2018