THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:11:21 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Kharkov Medical University, 2003
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 450 Wilson Avenue
Toronto Ontario M3H 1T9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4166304706
Fax: 6476892195
Address: 1104 Fennell Ave E
Hamilton ON L8T 1R9
Phone: 2896744800
Fax: 2896744800
Address: 168 Barton Street
Hamilton Ontario L8E 4V6
Phone: 905-664-6762
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2132 King Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8K 1W6
Phone: 905-543-9797
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 195 Broadway
Orangeville ON L9W 1K2
Phone: 289 674 4801
Fax: 289 674 4802
Address: 837 Wilson Avenue
Toronto Ontario M3K 1E4
Phone: 416-630-4706
Fax: 647-689-2195

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 May 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 16 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - New Brunswick
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Kharkov Medical University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 450 Wilson Avenue
Toronto Ontario M3H 1T9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4166304706
Fax: 6476892195
Address: 1104 Fennell Ave E
Hamilton ON L8T 1R9
Phone: 2896744800
Fax: 2896744800
Address: 168 Barton Street
Hamilton Ontario L8E 4V6
Phone: 905-664-6762
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2132 King Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8K 1W6
Phone: 905-543-9797
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 195 Broadway
Orangeville ON L9W 1K2
Phone: 289 674 4801
Fax: 289 674 4802
Address: 837 Wilson Avenue
Toronto Ontario M3K 1E4
Phone: 416-630-4706
Fax: 647-689-2195

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 May 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 16 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - New Brunswick
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. OLUWOLE OLUWASEUN ADEBAJO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ADEBAJO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. OLUWOLE OLUWASEUN ADEBAJO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ADEBAJO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Kharkov Medical University, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Aug 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 19 Apr 2018
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Aug 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 09 Aug 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Apr 2018
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 19 Apr 2018