THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 04:31:18 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Umm Al-Qura University Faculty of Medicine, 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Postgraduate Medical Education
McMaster University
Room MDCL - 3101A
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8S 4K1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 2898288187
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatric Emergency Medicine
Effective: 20 Sep 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 10 Aug 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatric Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 20 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 10 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Umm Al-Qura University Faculty of Medicine, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Postgraduate Medical Education
McMaster University
Room MDCL - 3101A
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8S 4K1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 2898288187
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatric Emergency Medicine
Effective: 20 Sep 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 10 Aug 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatric Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 20 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 10 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. OMAR SALEM A TAIBAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAIBAH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. OMAR SALEM A TAIBAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAIBAH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Umm Al-Qura University Faculty of Medicine, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jan 2024
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 08 May 2018
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Jan 2024

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 May 2018