THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/05/25 04:48:16 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: King Abdulaziz University College of Medicine, 2014
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Postgraduate Medical Education
University of Toronto
500 University Avenue, Suite 602
Toronto Ontario M5G 1V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: King Abdulaziz University College of Medicine, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Postgraduate Medical Education
University of Toronto
500 University Avenue, Suite 602
Toronto Ontario M5G 1V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ABDULRAHMAN IHSAN K ALRIFAI shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. ALRIFAI is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. ALRIFAI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ALRIFAI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. ALRIFAI shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. ALRIFAI is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. ALRIFAI no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 15 September, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ABDULRAHMAN IHSAN K ALRIFAI shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. ALRIFAI is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. ALRIFAI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ALRIFAI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. ALRIFAI shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. ALRIFAI is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. ALRIFAI no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 15 September, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: King Abdulaziz University College of Medicine, 2014
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery
01 Jul 2025 to 15 Sep 2025
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery
16 Sep 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery
01 Jul 2024 to 31 Jul 2024
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery
01 Aug 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery
16 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery
01 Jul 2022 to 15 Jul 2022
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery
16 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery
01 Jul 2021 to 15 Jul 2021
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery
16 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery
01 Jul 2020 to 15 Jul 2020
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery
16 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery
01 Jul 2019 to 15 Jul 2019
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery
16 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
University of Toronto
PEAP - R - Orthopedic Surgery
23 Apr 2018 to 15 Jul 2018
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 15 Sep 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery
DATE: 16 Sep 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 31 Jul 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery
DATE: 01 Aug 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery
DATE: 16 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 15 Jul 2022
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery
DATE: 16 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2021 to 15 Jul 2021
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery
DATE: 16 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2020 to 15 Jul 2020
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery
DATE: 16 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2019 to 15 Jul 2019
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery
DATE: 16 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PEAP - R - Orthopedic Surgery
DATE: 23 Apr 2018 to 15 Jul 2018
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 15 Sep 2025
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Jul 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 23 Apr 2018
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 15 Sep 2025

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Oct 2024

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Jul 2024

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Sep 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2023

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jul 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Apr 2018