THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 03:34:04 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Universidade Federal Do Espirito Santo, 2005
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 5546 Portage Rd
Greater Niagara General Hospital
Neurology clinic
Niagara Falls Ontario L2E 6X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 357 3644
Fax: 905 357 9230
Address: 237 Barton St E
Hamilton General Hospital
Stroke Prevention Clinic (2nd floor East)
Hamilton ON L8L 2X2
Phone: 905 521 2100
Extension: 44713
Fax: 905 577 8044

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 01 Jul 2022
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Greater Niagara General Hospital
Neurology Clinic
5546 Portage Road
Niagara Falls ON L2E 6X2
Phone: (905) 357-3644
Fax: (905) 357-9230 Electoral District: 04
Date Received: 02 Jul 2022

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System Niagara Falls
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System
LOCATION: Niagara Falls

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Universidade Federal Do Espirito Santo, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 5546 Portage Rd
Greater Niagara General Hospital
Neurology clinic
Niagara Falls Ontario L2E 6X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 357 3644
Fax: 905 357 9230
Address: 237 Barton St E
Hamilton General Hospital
Stroke Prevention Clinic (2nd floor East)
Hamilton ON L8L 2X2
Phone: 905 521 2100
Extension: 44713
Fax: 905 577 8044

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 01 Jul 2022
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Greater Niagara General Hospital
Neurology Clinic
5546 Portage Road
Niagara Falls ON L2E 6X2
Phone: (905) 357-3644
Fax: (905) 357-9230 Electoral District: 04
Date Received: 02 Jul 2022

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System Niagara Falls
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System
LOCATION: Niagara Falls

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
04 Apr 2025
30 Jun 2026
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Apr 04 2025
EXPIRY DATE: Jun 30 2026
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. DANIELLE DE SA BOASQUEVISQUE may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine, Division of Neurology, McMaster University, in which Dr. DE SA BOASQUEVISQUE holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. DE SA BOASQUEVISQUE no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. DE SA BOASQUEVISQUE’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. DE SA BOASQUEVISQUE’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 01 July, 2022, and expires on 30 June, 2026. Upon renewal of Dr. DE SA BOASQUEVISQUE's academic appointment at McMaster University, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. DANIELLE DE SA BOASQUEVISQUE may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine, Division of Neurology, McMaster University, in which Dr. DE SA BOASQUEVISQUE holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. DE SA BOASQUEVISQUE no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. DE SA BOASQUEVISQUE’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. DE SA BOASQUEVISQUE’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 01 July, 2022, and expires on 30 June, 2026. Upon renewal of Dr. DE SA BOASQUEVISQUE's academic appointment at McMaster University, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Universidade Federal Do Espirito Santo, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2026
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 23 Apr 2018
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2026

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2022
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2022

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Apr 2018