THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 06:16:29 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Windsor University School of Medicine, 2011
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, YORUBA

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 60 Cornelia Street West
Smiths Falls Ontario K7A 2H9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-283-2330
Fax: 613-283-3515

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Nigeria

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Perth
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Smiths Falls Community Site Smiths Falls
HOSPITAL: Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital
LOCATION: Perth

HOSPITAL: Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Smiths Falls Community Site
LOCATION: Smiths Falls

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, YORUBA
Medical School: Windsor University School of Medicine, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 60 Cornelia Street West
Smiths Falls Ontario K7A 2H9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-283-2330
Fax: 613-283-3515

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Nigeria

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Perth
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Smiths Falls Community Site Smiths Falls
HOSPITAL: Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital
LOCATION: Perth

HOSPITAL: Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Smiths Falls Community Site
LOCATION: Smiths Falls

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ADEOLA EMMANUEL DARE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DARE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ADEOLA EMMANUEL DARE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DARE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Windsor University School of Medicine, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Dec 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Dec 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 17 Dec 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Dec 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2020

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018