THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
19/05/25 03:25:35 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 2016
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, MANDARIN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, MANDARIN
Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 2016
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology
01 Jul 2022 to 31 Jul 2022
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology
01 Aug 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
University of Toronto
EL - Nephrology
01 Jul 2021 to 31 Jul 2021
University of Toronto
EL - Nephrology
07 May 2018 to 03 Jun 2018
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Nephrology
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 31 Jul 2022
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Nephrology
DATE: 01 Aug 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: EL - Nephrology
DATE: 01 Jul 2021 to 31 Jul 2021
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: EL - Nephrology
DATE: 07 May 2018 to 03 Jun 2018
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Jul 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 03 Jun 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 May 2018
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Jul 2022

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2021

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 03 Jun 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 May 2018