THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:12:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2017
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Postgraduate Medical Education
University of Toronto
500 University Avenue, Suite 602
Toronto Ontario M5G 1V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: St. Michael’s Hospital
36 Queen St E
Toronto ON M5B 1W8
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Postgraduate Medical Education
University of Toronto
500 University Avenue, Suite 602
Toronto Ontario M5G 1V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: St. Michael’s Hospital
36 Queen St E
Toronto ON M5B 1W8
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. THOMAS JOHN BEGGS may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. BEGGS is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. BEGGS shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. BEGGS is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. BEGGS shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. BEGGS ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. BEGGS ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2026.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. THOMAS JOHN BEGGS may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. BEGGS is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. BEGGS shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. BEGGS is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. BEGGS shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. BEGGS ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. BEGGS ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2026.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2017
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
26 Aug 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
01 Jul 2023 to 05 May 2024
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
20 Mar 2023 to 30 Jun 2023
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
01 Jan 2023 to 19 Mar 2023
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
01 Jul 2022 to 31 Dec 2022
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
20 Aug 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
01 Jul 2021 to 19 Aug 2021
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
20 Aug 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
01 Jul 2020 to 19 Aug 2020
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
20 Aug 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology
01 Jul 2019 to 19 Aug 2019
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology
23 Sep 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
University of Toronto
AVP - Anesthesiology
01 Jul 2018 to 22 Sep 2018
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
DATE: 26 Aug 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 05 May 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
DATE: 20 Mar 2023 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
DATE: 01 Jan 2023 to 19 Mar 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 31 Dec 2022
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
DATE: 20 Aug 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2021 to 19 Aug 2021
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
DATE: 20 Aug 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2020 to 19 Aug 2020
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
DATE: 20 Aug 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2019 to 19 Aug 2019
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology
DATE: 23 Sep 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: AVP - Anesthesiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2018 to 22 Sep 2018
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2026
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 05 May 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 17 Dec 2021
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2026

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Aug 2024

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 05 May 2024

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2022

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Dec 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 17 Dec 2021

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018