THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
26/05/25 04:43:25 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Univerzity P.J. Safarika, 2005
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CZECH, SLOVAK

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 90 Royal Landing Gate
Kemptville ON K0G 1J0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6132580100
Fax: 6132586171

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kemptville District Hospital Kemptville
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Kemptville District Hospital
LOCATION: Kemptville

HOSPITAL: Queensway Carleton Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CZECH, SLOVAK
Medical School: Univerzity P.J. Safarika, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 90 Royal Landing Gate
Kemptville ON K0G 1J0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6132580100
Fax: 6132586171

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kemptville District Hospital Kemptville
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Kemptville District Hospital
LOCATION: Kemptville

HOSPITAL: Queensway Carleton Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALENA MCCARRELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCCARRELL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALENA MCCARRELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCCARRELL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Univerzity P.J. Safarika, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Dec 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 18 Dec 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Dec 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 18 Dec 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2020

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018