THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 04:24:23 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2018
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 596 Davis Drive
Southlake Regional Health Center
Division of Infectious Diseases
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058954521
Fax: 905-853-2299
Address: The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Department of Internal Medicine
501 Smyth Rd
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 722-7000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Infectious Diseases
Effective: 20 Sep 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 03 May 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Infectious Diseases
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 20 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 03 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 596 Davis Drive
Southlake Regional Health Center
Division of Infectious Diseases
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058954521
Fax: 905-853-2299
Address: The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Department of Internal Medicine
501 Smyth Rd
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 722-7000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Infectious Diseases
Effective: 20 Sep 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 03 May 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Infectious Diseases
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 20 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 03 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SONIA MARIA POENARU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POENARU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SONIA MARIA POENARU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POENARU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jun 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018