THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 05:22:51 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2018
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
501 Smyth Rd
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 798-5555
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 24 Apr 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 24 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
501 Smyth Rd
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 798-5555
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 24 Apr 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 24 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ISABEL THEBERGE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THEBERGE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ISABEL THEBERGE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THEBERGE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 14 Aug 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jun 2024

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Sep 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 27 Sep 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 14 Aug 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Aug 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 14 Aug 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018