THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:22:40 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2018
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 179 Old Highway 17
Plantagenet Family Health Team
Plantagenet Ontario K0B 1L0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6136734318
Fax: 6136734480
Address: Montfort Hospital
Department of Family Medicine
713 Montreal Rd

Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T2
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital Montfort Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Hopital Montfort
LOCATION: Ottawa

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 179 Old Highway 17
Plantagenet Family Health Team
Plantagenet Ontario K0B 1L0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6136734318
Fax: 6136734480
Address: Montfort Hospital
Department of Family Medicine
713 Montreal Rd

Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T2
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital Montfort Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Hopital Montfort
LOCATION: Ottawa

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LYDIA RICHARDSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RICHARDSON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LYDIA RICHARDSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RICHARDSON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Apr 2021
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 12 Mar 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 16 Oct 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 12 Oct 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Apr 2021

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 12 Mar 2021

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Oct 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 16 Oct 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 12 Oct 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018