THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 06:04:06 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2018
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: University of Ottawa
Student Health and Wellness Centre
N205-801 King Edward Ave
Ottawa ON K1N 6N5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-562-5498
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 211 Lennox Park Ave
Ottawa ON K1G 0K3
Phone: 6132556603
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3771 Spratt Road
Unit 10
Ottawa Ontario K1V 2P3
Phone: 613-695-5268
Fax: 613-788-2752
Address: Manoir Rockland Manor
9045 County Road 17
Rockland ON K4K 0J9
Phone: 613-627-4854
Fax: 613-319-7898

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: University of Ottawa
Student Health and Wellness Centre
N205-801 King Edward Ave
Ottawa ON K1N 6N5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-562-5498
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 211 Lennox Park Ave
Ottawa ON K1G 0K3
Phone: 6132556603
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3771 Spratt Road
Unit 10
Ottawa Ontario K1V 2P3
Phone: 613-695-5268
Fax: 613-788-2752
Address: Manoir Rockland Manor
9045 County Road 17
Rockland ON K4K 0J9
Phone: 613-627-4854
Fax: 613-319-7898

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. REBECCA ELIZABETH CHASE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHASE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. REBECCA ELIZABETH CHASE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHASE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 26 Apr 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 08 Mar 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Jul 2021

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Apr 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 26 Apr 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 08 Mar 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018