THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:29:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2018
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Postgraduate Medical Education
Schulich School of Medicine
University of Western Ontario
Room M106 Medical Science Building
London Ontario N6A 5C1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613 371 7746
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Postgraduate Medical Education
Schulich School of Medicine
University of Western Ontario
Room M106 Medical Science Building
London Ontario N6A 5C1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613 371 7746
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EMILIE LIANE DESCHNER shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. DESCHNER is enrolled at Western University;
(2) Dr. DESCHNER shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. DESCHNER is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. DESCHNER shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. DESCHNER is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. DESCHNER no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 16 June, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EMILIE LIANE DESCHNER shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. DESCHNER is enrolled at Western University;
(2) Dr. DESCHNER shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. DESCHNER is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. DESCHNER shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. DESCHNER is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. DESCHNER no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 16 June, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2018
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Internal Medicine
24 Sep 2024 to 16 Jun 2025
Western University
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Internal Medicine
01 Jul 2024 to 23 Sep 2024
Western University
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Internal Medicine
26 Sep 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
Western University
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Internal Medicine
01 Jul 2023 to 25 Sep 2023
Western University
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Internal Medicine
27 Sep 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
Western University
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
01 Jul 2022 to 26 Sep 2022
Western University
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
17 Dec 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
Western University
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
01 Jul 2021 to 16 Dec 2021
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
17 Dec 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
01 Jul 2020 to 16 Dec 2020
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
17 Dec 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
01 Jul 2019 to 16 Dec 2019
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
07 May 2019 to 30 Jun 2019
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
01 Jul 2018 to 06 May 2019
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - General Internal Medicine
DATE: 24 Sep 2024 to 16 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - General Internal Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 23 Sep 2024
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - General Internal Medicine
DATE: 26 Sep 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - General Internal Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 25 Sep 2023
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - General Internal Medicine
DATE: 27 Sep 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 26 Sep 2022
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
DATE: 17 Dec 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2021 to 16 Dec 2021
UNIVERSITY: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
DATE: 17 Dec 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
UNIVERSITY: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2020 to 16 Dec 2020
UNIVERSITY: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
DATE: 17 Dec 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
UNIVERSITY: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2019 to 16 Dec 2019
UNIVERSITY: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
DATE: 07 May 2019 to 30 Jun 2019
UNIVERSITY: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2018 to 06 May 2019
UNIVERSITY: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 16 Jun 2025
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 16 Jun 2025

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018