THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
12/05/25 05:59:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Rosalind Franklin University of Med.& Sc, 2016
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1005 Skyview Drive
Suite 114
Burlington Ontario L7P 5B1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 289 635 2226
Fax: 289 635 2029

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 17 Jun 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 30 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Rosalind Franklin University of Med.& Sc, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1005 Skyview Drive
Suite 114
Burlington Ontario L7P 5B1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 289 635 2226
Fax: 289 635 2029

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 17 Jun 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 30 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHANTELLE MALTEZ CARNEIRO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CARNEIRO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHANTELLE MALTEZ CARNEIRO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CARNEIRO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Rosalind Franklin University of Med.& Sc, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Feb 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 17 Aug 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Feb 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2021

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 17 Aug 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jul 2018