THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/05/25 04:31:46 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Sint Eustatius, 2013
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 34 Benwood Ave
Buffalo NY 14214-1814
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 717-526-9340
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Medicine
Effective: 25 Oct 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 May 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 25 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 16 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU
Medical School: University of Sint Eustatius, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 34 Benwood Ave
Buffalo NY 14214-1814
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 717-526-9340
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Medicine
Effective: 25 Oct 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 May 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 25 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 16 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHAHLA AHMAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AHMAD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHAHLA AHMAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AHMAD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Sint Eustatius, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 May 2018
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 May 2018