THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 04:14:50 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2018
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 869 Notre-Dame St
Clinique médicale d'Embrun
Embrun Ontario K0A 1W0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-443-3311
Fax: 613-443-0142

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 869 Notre-Dame St
Clinique médicale d'Embrun
Embrun Ontario K0A 1W0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-443-3311
Fax: 613-443-0142

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARIE-NOELLE LACROIX may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LACROIX is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARIE-NOELLE LACROIX may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LACROIX is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 May 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jun 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 May 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018