THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:47:03 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2018
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1235 Wilson Ave
Humber River Hospital
Emergency Department
North York ON M3M 0B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 30 The Queensway
St. Joseph's Health Centre
Emergency Department
Toronto ON M6R 1B5
Phone: 4165306000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 08 Nov 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 08 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
Humber River Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1235 Wilson Ave
Humber River Hospital
Emergency Department
North York ON M3M 0B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 30 The Queensway
St. Joseph's Health Centre
Emergency Department
Toronto ON M6R 1B5
Phone: 4165306000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 08 Nov 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 08 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
Humber River Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARCO JOSE DA SILVA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DA SILVA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARCO JOSE DA SILVA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DA SILVA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Feb 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Feb 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018