THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:58:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Yeshiva Univ Albert Einstein Coll of Med, 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Pediatric Critical
Care
555 University Ave
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 813-1500
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 345 1/2 Wellesley St E
Toronto ON M4X 1H2
Phone: 4169928751
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 01 Jan 2020
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 01 Jan 2020
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 01 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 01 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nicole McKinnon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Aug 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. N. McKinnon (CPSO#: 115052 )
Business Address: Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
(416) 813-1500

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Yeshiva Univ Albert Einstein Coll of Med, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Pediatric Critical
Care
555 University Ave
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 813-1500
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 345 1/2 Wellesley St E
Toronto ON M4X 1H2
Phone: 4169928751
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 01 Jan 2020
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 01 Jan 2020
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 01 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 01 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nicole McKinnon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Aug 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. N. McKinnon (CPSO#: 115052 )
Business Address: Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
(416) 813-1500

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
01 Jan 2020
31 Dec 2026
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jan 01 2020
EXPIRY DATE: Dec 31 2026
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. Nicole Katherine Ann McKinnon may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of
Pediatrics, Division of Critical Care Medicine, University of
Toronto, in which Dr. McKinnon holds an academic appointment at the
rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from
the date of issuance or when Dr. McKinnon no longer holds the academic
appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. McKinnon's
clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional
conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a
report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. McKinnon's
certificate of registration, following consideration of the
practice assessment report.


Note: This certificate is issued on January 1, 2020. In accordance with
paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the
Registration Committee, automatically expire on December 31, 2026.


VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. Nicole Katherine Ann McKinnon may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of
Pediatrics, Division of Critical Care Medicine, University of
Toronto, in which Dr. McKinnon holds an academic appointment at the
rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from
the date of issuance or when Dr. McKinnon no longer holds the academic
appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. McKinnon's
clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional
conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a
report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. McKinnon's
certificate of registration, following consideration of the
practice assessment report.


Note: This certificate is issued on January 1, 2020. In accordance with
paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the
Registration Committee, automatically expire on December 31, 2026.


Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Yeshiva Univ Albert Einstein Coll of Med, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jan 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jan 2020
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 31 Dec 2026

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018