THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 05:00:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2018
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, PORTUGUESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 501 Smyth Road
The Ottawa Hospital
Department of Hematology
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8M2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-737-8899
Extension: 77576
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematology
Effective: 02 Nov 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 02 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, PORTUGUESE
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 501 Smyth Road
The Ottawa Hospital
Department of Hematology
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8M2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-737-8899
Extension: 77576
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematology
Effective: 02 Nov 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 02 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MELISSA TEIXEIRA MALTEZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALTEZ is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MELISSA TEIXEIRA MALTEZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALTEZ is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jun 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Jun 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018