THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 05:04:46 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: All Saints University (Dominica), 2015
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 12 Sunvale Drive
Toronto Ontario M9R 1Z3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4165251866
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Urology
Effective: 30 Jun 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Urology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - District of Columbia
USA - Maryland

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI
Medical School: All Saints University (Dominica), 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 12 Sunvale Drive
Toronto Ontario M9R 1Z3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4165251866
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Urology
Effective: 30 Jun 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Urology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - District of Columbia
USA - Maryland

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JASKIRAT SINGH SAINI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAINI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JASKIRAT SINGH SAINI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAINI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: All Saints University (Dominica), 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2024
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Aug 2024

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2024

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018