THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:31:47 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2018
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, AFRIKAANS

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 104-125 Bell Farm Rd
Barrie ON L4M 6L2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7057922145
Fax: 7057922147
Address: 102-480 Huronia Rd
Huronia Urgent Care Clinic
Barrie ON L4N 6M2
Phone: 7057920933
Fax: 7057920966
Address: 104-125 Bell Farm Rd
Barrie North Family Medicine
Barrie ON L4M 6L2
Phone: 7057922145
Fax: 7057922147
Address: 103-190 Cundles Rd E
Barrie ON L4M 4S5
Phone: 7057350617
Fax: 7057375766
Address: 202-5 Quarry Ridge Rd
Barrie ON L4M 7G1
Phone: (705) 792-4800
Fax: (705) 792-4009
Address: 203-5 Quarry Ridge Rd
Barrie ON L4M 7G1
Phone: 705-725-0588
Fax: 705-728-3813

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, AFRIKAANS
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 104-125 Bell Farm Rd
Barrie ON L4M 6L2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7057922145
Fax: 7057922147
Address: 102-480 Huronia Rd
Huronia Urgent Care Clinic
Barrie ON L4N 6M2
Phone: 7057920933
Fax: 7057920966
Address: 104-125 Bell Farm Rd
Barrie North Family Medicine
Barrie ON L4M 6L2
Phone: 7057922145
Fax: 7057922147
Address: 103-190 Cundles Rd E
Barrie ON L4M 4S5
Phone: 7057350617
Fax: 7057375766
Address: 202-5 Quarry Ridge Rd
Barrie ON L4M 7G1
Phone: (705) 792-4800
Fax: (705) 792-4009
Address: 203-5 Quarry Ridge Rd
Barrie ON L4M 7G1
Phone: 705-725-0588
Fax: 705-728-3813

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANZEL HENNOP may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HENNOP is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANZEL HENNOP may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HENNOP is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 2021
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 24 Jun 2021
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 17 Dec 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Sep 2021

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 2021

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 17 Dec 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018