THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:34:08 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Manchester Medical School, 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 201A
600 Princess Street
Woodstock Ontario N4S 4H4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-602-4111
Fax: 519-602-4110

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Jul 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Dec 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 06 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Woodstock Hospital Woodstock
HOSPITAL: Woodstock Hospital
LOCATION: Woodstock

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Manchester Medical School, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 201A
600 Princess Street
Woodstock Ontario N4S 4H4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-602-4111
Fax: 519-602-4110

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Jul 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Dec 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 06 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Woodstock Hospital Woodstock
HOSPITAL: Woodstock Hospital
LOCATION: Woodstock

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHAMEENA TAMACHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAMACHI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHAMEENA TAMACHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAMACHI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Manchester Medical School, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Feb 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 09 Jun 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 28 May 2018
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Feb 2022

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Jun 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 09 Jun 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 May 2018
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 28 May 2018