THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 06:55:16 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2018
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 459 Hume St
Collingwood ON L9Y 1W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7054452550
Fax: 7054458661

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood
HOSPITAL: Collingwood General and Marine Hospital
LOCATION: Collingwood

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 459 Hume St
Collingwood ON L9Y 1W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7054452550
Fax: 7054458661

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood
HOSPITAL: Collingwood General and Marine Hospital
LOCATION: Collingwood

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SOHAIL FARUKH SARDAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SARDAR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SOHAIL FARUKH SARDAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SARDAR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2021
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 19 Jan 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 2021

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 19 Jan 2021

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 23 Jul 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018