THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:50:23 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2018
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1-1018 Pelham St
Fonthill ON L0S 1E4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1-1018 Pelham St
Fonthill ON L0S 1E4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ELLEN LOUISE ROBB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROBB is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ELLEN LOUISE ROBB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROBB is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Apr 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 05 Mar 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 14 Dec 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Apr 2021

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Mar 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 05 Mar 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 14 Dec 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018