THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:39:23 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2018
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 145 Front Street East
Inner City Health Associates
Toronto Ontario M5A 1E3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-591-4411
Fax: 416-640-2072
Address: 580 Harwood Ave S
Lakeridge Health - Ajax Pickering
Ajax ON L1S 2J4
Phone: 905-683-2320
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 170 Colborne Street West
Orillia Soldiers' Memorial Hospital
Orillia Ontario L3V 2Z3
Phone: (705) 325-2201
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1451 Queen St W
Centre for Addiction and Mental Health
Toronto ON M6R 1A1
Phone: 416 535-8501
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Unity Health Toronto Toronto
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health Toronto
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia
HOSPITAL: Unity Health Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Centre for Addiction & Mental Health
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Orillia

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 145 Front Street East
Inner City Health Associates
Toronto Ontario M5A 1E3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-591-4411
Fax: 416-640-2072
Address: 580 Harwood Ave S
Lakeridge Health - Ajax Pickering
Ajax ON L1S 2J4
Phone: 905-683-2320
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 170 Colborne Street West
Orillia Soldiers' Memorial Hospital
Orillia Ontario L3V 2Z3
Phone: (705) 325-2201
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1451 Queen St W
Centre for Addiction and Mental Health
Toronto ON M6R 1A1
Phone: 416 535-8501
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Unity Health Toronto Toronto
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health Toronto
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia
HOSPITAL: Unity Health Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Centre for Addiction & Mental Health
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Orillia

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID ROSS ANDERSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANDERSON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID ROSS ANDERSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANDERSON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Dec 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Dec 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 11 Dec 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Dec 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018