THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 04:47:42 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Alexandria University Faculty of Medicine, 2014
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Postgraduate Medical Education
University of Ottawa
451 Smyth Road, Room 2044
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6135625800
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Sep 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 20 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ARABIC
Medical School: Alexandria University Faculty of Medicine, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Postgraduate Medical Education
University of Ottawa
451 Smyth Road, Room 2044
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6135625800
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Sep 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 20 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NOURHAN MOHAMED SHEHATA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHEHATA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NOURHAN MOHAMED SHEHATA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHEHATA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Alexandria University Faculty of Medicine, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Nov 2023
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Oct 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Nov 2023

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Oct 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Jul 2018