THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:43:21 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2018
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3050 Lawrence Ave E
Scarborough General
Emergency Medicine
Scarborough ON M1P 2V5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 438-2911
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 07 Feb 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 07 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
North York General Hospital Toronto
Oak Valley Health Markham
Northumberland Hills Hospital Cobourg
Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

HOSPITAL: Northumberland Hills Hospital
LOCATION: Cobourg

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site
LOCATION: Ajax

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3050 Lawrence Ave E
Scarborough General
Emergency Medicine
Scarborough ON M1P 2V5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 438-2911
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 07 Feb 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 07 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
North York General Hospital Toronto
Oak Valley Health Markham
Northumberland Hills Hospital Cobourg
Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

HOSPITAL: Northumberland Hills Hospital
LOCATION: Cobourg

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site
LOCATION: Ajax

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MEGHAN BHATIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BHATIA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MEGHAN BHATIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BHATIA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Feb 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Feb 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018