THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 06:50:20 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2018
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 175 Elizabeth Street
The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Pediatric Emergency Medicine, Department of Pediatrics
Floor 12
Toronto Ontario M5G 2G3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-813-7654
Extension: 403480
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatric Emergency Medicine
Effective: 20 Sep 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatric Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 20 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 175 Elizabeth Street
The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Pediatric Emergency Medicine, Department of Pediatrics
Floor 12
Toronto Ontario M5G 2G3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-813-7654
Extension: 403480
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatric Emergency Medicine
Effective: 20 Sep 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatric Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 20 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MELISSA KRISTEN LORENZO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LORENZO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MELISSA KRISTEN LORENZO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LORENZO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018