THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/05/25 04:25:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2018
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Postgraduate Medical Education
University of Toronto
500 University Avenue, Suite 602
Toronto Ontario M5G 1V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 237 Barton St E
Hamilton ON L8L 2X2
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Brant Community Healthcare System
LOCATION: Brantford

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Postgraduate Medical Education
University of Toronto
500 University Avenue, Suite 602
Toronto Ontario M5G 1V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 237 Barton St E
Hamilton ON L8L 2X2
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Brant Community Healthcare System
LOCATION: Brantford

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JONATHAN HENRY GLADSTONE AJZENBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AJZENBERG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JONATHAN HENRY GLADSTONE AJZENBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AJZENBERG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2021
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 22 Apr 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 22 Oct 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Jul 2022
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 06 Jul 2022

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2021

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 22 Apr 2021

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Oct 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 22 Oct 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 22 Oct 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018