THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 05:00:47 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Northwestern University, 2016
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough General Hospital
Toronto Ontario M1P 2V5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4164382911
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 10 Trench Street
Mackenzie Richmond Hill Hospital
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 4Z3
Phone: 905-883-1212
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3030 Birchmount Road
Birchmount Hospital
Toronto Ontario M1W 3W3
Phone: 416-495-2400
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2867 Ellesmere Road
Centenary Hospital
Toronto Ontario M1E 4B9
Phone: 416-284-8131
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 520 Ellesmere Road
Suite 301
Toronto Lung Care Clinic
Toronto Ontario M1R 0B1
Phone: 4164390120
Fax: 4164395508
Address: 1110 Sheppard Avenue East
Suite 204
Toronto Lung Care Clinic
Toronto Ontario M2K 2W1
Phone: 4162292315
Fax: 4162239828
Address: 3200 Major Mackenzie Drive West
Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital
Vaughan Ontario L6A 4Z3
Phone: 905-417-2000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 17 Oct 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 20 Sep 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 12 Mar 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 17 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 20 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 12 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital Vaughan
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital
LOCATION: Vaughan

HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Northwestern University, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough General Hospital
Toronto Ontario M1P 2V5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4164382911
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 10 Trench Street
Mackenzie Richmond Hill Hospital
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 4Z3
Phone: 905-883-1212
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3030 Birchmount Road
Birchmount Hospital
Toronto Ontario M1W 3W3
Phone: 416-495-2400
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2867 Ellesmere Road
Centenary Hospital
Toronto Ontario M1E 4B9
Phone: 416-284-8131
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 520 Ellesmere Road
Suite 301
Toronto Lung Care Clinic
Toronto Ontario M1R 0B1
Phone: 4164390120
Fax: 4164395508
Address: 1110 Sheppard Avenue East
Suite 204
Toronto Lung Care Clinic
Toronto Ontario M2K 2W1
Phone: 4162292315
Fax: 4162239828
Address: 3200 Major Mackenzie Drive West
Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital
Vaughan Ontario L6A 4Z3
Phone: 905-417-2000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 17 Oct 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 20 Sep 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 12 Mar 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 17 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 20 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 12 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital Vaughan
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital
LOCATION: Vaughan

HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ARIELLA CHANA PRATZER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PRATZER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ARIELLA CHANA PRATZER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PRATZER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Northwestern University, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Dec 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Jul 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Dec 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Jul 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jul 2018