THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:15:35 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2017
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 221 Brant Ave
Brantford ON N3T 3J3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5197538666
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 221 Brant Ave
Brantford ON N3T 3J3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5197538666
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NATASHA ELYSE MCNAMARA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCNAMARA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NATASHA ELYSE MCNAMARA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCNAMARA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 21 Sep 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 29 Jun 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jun 2018
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 21 Sep 2018

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Sep 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 29 Jun 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Jun 2018