THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 02:55:11 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2018
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Calgary, 2018
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology
01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology
01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology
01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology
01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology
01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
McMaster University
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology
DATE: 01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology
DATE: 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology
DATE: 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology
DATE: 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018