THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 07:04:22 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2018
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 88 Maplewood Ave
St. Peter's Hospital
Division of Geriatric Medicine
Hamilton ON L8M 1W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 777-3837
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 88 Maplewood Ave
St. Peter's Hospital
Division of Geriatric Medicine
Hamilton ON L8M 1W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 777-3837
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CATHERINE SARAH LEURER shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. LEURER is enrolled at McMaster University;
(2) Dr. LEURER shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. LEURER is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. LEURER shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. LEURER is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. LEURER no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CATHERINE SARAH LEURER shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. LEURER is enrolled at McMaster University;
(2) Dr. LEURER shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. LEURER is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. LEURER shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. LEURER is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. LEURER no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2018
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 5 - Geriatric Medicine
03 Jun 2025 to 30 Jun 2025
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 5 - Geriatric Medicine
01 Jul 2024 to 02 Jun 2025
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 5 - Geriatric Medicine
01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 4 - Geriatric Medicine
01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 4 - Geriatric Medicine
01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Geriatric Medicine
DATE: 03 Jun 2025 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Geriatric Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 02 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Geriatric Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Geriatric Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Geriatric Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2025
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018