THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
14/05/25 03:11:33 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2018
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MANDARIN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 306-377 Church Street
Markham Ontario L6B
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-554-4001
Fax: 905-554-4002
Address: 377 Church Street
Centre for Respiratory Health
G7
Markham Ontario L6B 1A1
Phone: 905-472-7614
Fax: 905-472-7618

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MANDARIN
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 306-377 Church Street
Markham Ontario L6B
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-554-4001
Fax: 905-554-4002
Address: 377 Church Street
Centre for Respiratory Health
G7
Markham Ontario L6B 1A1
Phone: 905-472-7614
Fax: 905-472-7618

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. XIN YE WANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WANG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. XIN YE WANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WANG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018