THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 04:54:08 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2018
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 101 Queensway West
Summerville Family Health Team
Mississauga Ontario L5B 2V2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9052729700
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 101-1017 Carson Rd
Springwater ON L9X 0V7
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Sep 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 21 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 101 Queensway West
Summerville Family Health Team
Mississauga Ontario L5B 2V2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9052729700
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 101-1017 Carson Rd
Springwater ON L9X 0V7
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Sep 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 21 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
21 Sep 2024
20 Sep 2027
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Sep 21 2024
EXPIRY DATE: Sep 20 2027
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. AZZA EISSA may practise family medicine with Summerville Family Health Team in Mississauga, Ontario, while under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires three years from the date of issuance or when Dr. EISSA’s eligibility to take the College of Family Physicians of Canada examination expires, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the supervisor notifies the College of any concerns regarding Dr. EISSA’s knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude, does not provide the required reports to the College by the due date or if the reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(ii) the supervisor is no longer able or willing to continue to supervise Dr. EISSA’s practice.

Note: This certificate is issued on 21 September, 2024, and will expire on or before 20 September, 2027, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. AZZA EISSA may practise family medicine with Summerville Family Health Team in Mississauga, Ontario, while under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires three years from the date of issuance or when Dr. EISSA’s eligibility to take the College of Family Physicians of Canada examination expires, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the supervisor notifies the College of any concerns regarding Dr. EISSA’s knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude, does not provide the required reports to the College by the due date or if the reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(ii) the supervisor is no longer able or willing to continue to supervise Dr. EISSA’s practice.

Note: This certificate is issued on 21 September, 2024, and will expire on or before 20 September, 2027, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 03 May 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Apr 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Nov 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 18 Oct 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Sep 2024
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 21 Sep 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 20 Sep 2027

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 03 May 2024

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Apr 2024

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Nov 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jul 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 18 Oct 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018