THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
25/05/25 03:19:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2018
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 30 Bond St
St. Michael’s Hospital
Department of Family and Community Medicine
Toronto ON M5B 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 360-4000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 07 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 07 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 30 Bond St
St. Michael’s Hospital
Department of Family and Community Medicine
Toronto ON M5B 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 360-4000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 07 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 07 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ASHKAN JAVIDAN shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. JAVIDAN is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. JAVIDAN shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. JAVIDAN is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. JAVIDAN shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. JAVIDAN is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. JAVIDAN no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2026.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ASHKAN JAVIDAN shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. JAVIDAN is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. JAVIDAN shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. JAVIDAN is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. JAVIDAN shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. JAVIDAN is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. JAVIDAN no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2026.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2018
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
10 Jan 2024 to 30 Jun 2024
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
01 Jul 2023 to 09 Jan 2024
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
12 Aug 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
01 Jul 2019 to 11 Aug 2019
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
DATE: 10 Jan 2024 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 09 Jan 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
DATE: 12 Aug 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2019 to 11 Aug 2019
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2026
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Aug 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 22 Sep 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2026

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Aug 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 22 Sep 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018