THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 04:46:23 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2018
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1050 Military Trail
University of Toronto Scarborough Sam Ibrahim Building
Student Health and Wellness Centre
Unit IA5061
Toronto Ontario M1C 1G9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-287-7065
Extension: 2
Fax: 416-287-7069
Address: 262-2 King St W
Jackson Square Medical
Hamilton ON L8P 1A1
Phone: 289-309-2626
Fax: 905-524-1778

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1050 Military Trail
University of Toronto Scarborough Sam Ibrahim Building
Student Health and Wellness Centre
Unit IA5061
Toronto Ontario M1C 1G9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-287-7065
Extension: 2
Fax: 416-287-7069
Address: 262-2 King St W
Jackson Square Medical
Hamilton ON L8P 1A1
Phone: 289-309-2626
Fax: 905-524-1778

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARLA ROSE PRAGER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PRAGER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARLA ROSE PRAGER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PRAGER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Apr 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Apr 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018