THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 05:28:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Cardiff University School of Medicine, 2015
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 201 Georgian Dr
Royal Victoria Regional
Health Centre
Barrie ON L4M 6M2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7057289802
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 829 Big Bay Point Rd
Unit D13
Barrie ON L4N 0G5
Phone: 7057280037
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 170 Colborne St W
Orillia Soldiers' Memorial Hospital
Orillia ON L3V 2Z3
Phone: (705) 3252201
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia
HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

HOSPITAL: Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Orillia

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Cardiff University School of Medicine, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 201 Georgian Dr
Royal Victoria Regional
Health Centre
Barrie ON L4M 6M2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7057289802
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 829 Big Bay Point Rd
Unit D13
Barrie ON L4N 0G5
Phone: 7057280037
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 170 Colborne St W
Orillia Soldiers' Memorial Hospital
Orillia ON L3V 2Z3
Phone: (705) 3252201
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia
HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

HOSPITAL: Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Orillia

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MANISH PRAFUL RANPARA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RANPARA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MANISH PRAFUL RANPARA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RANPARA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Cardiff University School of Medicine, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Dec 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Dec 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 23 Aug 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Nov 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 2018
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Dec 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 11 Dec 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Aug 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 24 Aug 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 23 Aug 2020

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Nov 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Aug 2018