THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:07:25 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2018
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 625 Queen St E
Magenta Health - Riverside
Unit # 108
Toronto ON M4M 1G7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 647-479-8410
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Temiskaming Hospital New Liskeard
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Temiskaming Hospital
LOCATION: New Liskeard

HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 625 Queen St E
Magenta Health - Riverside
Unit # 108
Toronto ON M4M 1G7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 647-479-8410
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Temiskaming Hospital New Liskeard
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Temiskaming Hospital
LOCATION: New Liskeard

HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HEBA SHAMSI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAMSI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HEBA SHAMSI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAMSI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Feb 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Feb 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 10 Nov 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 20 Sep 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 16 Feb 2021

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Feb 2021

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Nov 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 10 Nov 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 20 Sep 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018